CT SB01057 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - House Calendar Number 548
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - House Calendar Number 548
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit a court of probate to authorize a conservator of the person to execute a written document in advance of the conserved person's death directing the disposition, custody and control of the conserved person's remains.
Title
An Act Concerning Advance Directives For The Disposition, Custody And Control Of The Body Of A Person For Whom A Conservator Of The Person Has Been Appointed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 229 PASS (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | House Calendar Number 548 | |
2011-05-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-20 | Senate Passed | |
2011-04-28 | File Number 665 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Calendar Number 405 | |
2011-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-15 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |