CT SB01070 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - File Number 295
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - File Number 295
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Veterans' Affairs to conduct a study concerning the operation of the Department of Veterans' Affairs.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Veterans' Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | File Number 295 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Calendar Number 196 | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-15 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-03-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Safety and Security | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |