CT SB01070 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To allow advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants to issue home health orders.
Title
An Act Concerning Physician Assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 440 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 363 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 225 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 363 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 225 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-28 | House | Public Act 21-196 |
2021-06-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | House | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-09 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10261 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 545 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9002 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | File Number 536 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 317 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/29 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |