CT SB01071 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide a state income tax credit to taxpayers who incur costs retrofitting a residence for purposes of allowing an individual to age in place.
Title
An Act Concerning Aging In Place Incentives.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Devin Carney [R] |
Sen. Leonard Fasano [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 733 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 354 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |