CT SB01140 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - File Number 458
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - File Number 458
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand the instances of when a holding company needs the Department of Public Utility Control's approval to acquire control over a gas, electric, electric distribution, water, telephone or community antenna television company.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Utility Control's Jurisdiction Regarding Holding Companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | File Number 458 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Calendar Number 263 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-22 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/10 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |