CT SB01140 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - House Calendar Number 594
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - House Calendar Number 594
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the rights and responsibilities of persons with the authority to make decisions concerning the care, custody and disposition of a deceased person's body.
Title
An Act Concerning The Duties Of A Conservator And Other Persons Authorized To Make Decisions Relating To The Care And Disposition Of A Deceased Person's Body.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 242 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 594 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | File Number 684 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 486 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/01 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |