DE HB113 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This bill changes the earned income tax credit from nonrefundable to refundable. This bill creates a table for the percentage of earned income credit for tax years 2018 and after. Currently, if spouses file a joint federal return but separate State returns, only the spouse with the higher taxes due can use the State earned income tax credit. This bill eliminates that limitation starting with tax year 2018 and provides that the credit shall be divided equally between such spouses.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Earned Income Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2018-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-07-01 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 113 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2017-05-17 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2017-05-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2017-05-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 113 - Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2017-05-09 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 113 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-04-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 12 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |