DE HB157 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act prohibits a pawnbroker, secondhand dealer, or scrap metal processor from purchasing or otherwise acquiring a gift card or other item in its original packaging unless the individual offering the item for sale produces a receipt or proof of purchase at the time of transaction. The Department of Homeland Security or its designee may seize an item found in violation of Chapter 23, Title 24 for a period of 30 days to allow the pawnbroker, secondhand dealer, or scrap metal processor an opportunity to provide a receipt or proof of ownership.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pawnbrokers, Secondhand Dealers And Scrap Metal Processors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2023-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-13 | Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2023-06-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |
2023-06-13 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 157 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2023-06-13 | Lifted From Table in House | |
2023-06-13 | Laid On Table in House | |
2023-05-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 5 Favorable | |
2023-05-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |