DE HB160 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-19 - Amendment HA 2 to HB 160 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-19 - Amendment HA 2 to HB 160 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Delaware End of Life Options Act provides an additional option which terminally ill adults nearing their death can decide to select, to lessen their pain and suffering. The bill clarifies the procedures necessary for making the request, including 1) the presentation of all end of life options which include comfort care, hospice care, and pain control, 2) a physicians evaluation, 3) medical confirmation by a second physician, 4) psychiatric/psychological counseling when indicated, 5) the passage of two waiting periods, and 6) the completion of a formally witnessed request for prescribed medication. The bill provides many safeguards to ensure the patient is making an informed decision, the right to rescind any request for medication, and immunity for persons participating in good faith compliance with the procedures. When the process is followed with its safeguards, the terminally ill patient is provided the right to receive medication to peacefully end the patients life in a humane and dignified manner.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To End Of Life Options.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] |
Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. Bryon Short [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-19 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 160 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-28 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 160 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable | |
2017-05-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |