DE HB318 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act requires the Department of Education to establish and implement a curriculum on the Holocaust and genocide for students in grades 6 through 12. Teaching the lessons learned from the Holocaust and other genocides helps cultivate the spirit of human resilience, courage, heroism, and tolerance. Education about the Holocaust and genocide provide a context to learn about the danger that befalls us when hatred goes unchallenged and there is indifference in the face of oppression of others. The Halina Wind Preston Holocaust Education Committee can provide guidance, academic content assistance, resources, and assistance with curricula development to deliver quality Holocaust and genocide education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Holocaust And Genocide Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23 Signed by Governor
2020-06-23 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-06-23 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-01-28 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2020-01-28 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2020-01-28 Amendment HA 1 to HB 318 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2020-01-28 Amendment HA 1 to HB 318 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2020-01-22 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2020-01-21 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback