DE HB364 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Electronic Funds Transfer Act (“EFTA”) was originally drafted to govern only consumer wire transfers. As a result, 4A-108 of Title 6 of the Delaware Code excluded fund transfers governed by EFTA from the scope of Article 4A of Title 6 (“Article 4A”). However, in 2010, the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act amended EFTA (“Dodd-Frank amendments”) to bring remittance transfers that are electronic fund transfers within its scope. Therefore, under 4A-108 of Title 6, even a remittance transfer that is not an electronic fund transfer, such as a commercial remittance transfer, is currently outside the scope of Article 4A. Consequently, there are no statutory rules governing remittance transfers that may involve mistaken addresses or payees, duties of intermediaries, and other issues beyond the initial sending of the transfer. This Act fills the gap created by the Dodd-Frank amendments by bringing under Article 4A remittance transfers that are not electronic fund transfers under EFTA, to the extent there is not an inconsistency between Article 4A and EFTA.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Funds Transfers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-10 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (BANKING AND BUSINESS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Banking and Business Committee in Senate |
2016-05-17 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-05-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |