DE HB63 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides important safeguards for vulnerable patients and residents who are treated in, or reside in healthcare, residential or treatment facilities, against sexual predators who exploit their infirmity or disability. Under this bill it is illegal for an employee or volunteer of a healthcare facility, nursing home, assisted living facility, long-term care residence, group home, psychiatric treatment facility residential substance abuse or mental health facility, or any facility required to be licensed under Title 16 of the Delaware Code to engage in sexual activity with a patient or resident of a facility. Consent shall not be a defense. Sexual contact with patient or resident by an employee or volunteer shall be a class G felony. Where an employee or volunteer engages in sexual penetration or sexual intercourse, the crime will be a Class C felony. Abuse, mistreatment or neglect resulting in serious physical injury is enhanced from a Class D felony to a Class C felony.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Sexual Abuse Of Patients In Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2011-04-12 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2011-03-29 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |