DE SB103 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 12 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 12 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends Section 3001(d)(1) of Title 14 to require that the Department of Education ensure that the standards of the Delaware Stars for Early Success system are consistent with the regulations of the Office of Child Care Licensing. It also removes the Office of Child Care Licensing from the Department of Services for Children, Youth and Their Families and puts it within the Department of Education to facilitate that consistency.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Early Childhood Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 12 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-14 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |
2019-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-13 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 103 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-11 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 103 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-05-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |