DE SB143 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill amends the membership of the Behavioral Health Consortium to include two members of both the House and Senate, a member from the Ability Network of Delaware, and the Mental Health Association in Delaware. The Bill also extends the date the first report is due from March 1, 2018 to April 16, 2018.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Establishment Of The Behavioral Health Consortium.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Rep. David Bentz [D] | Sen. Catherine Cloutier [R] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] |
Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-03-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-01 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2018-01-25 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-01-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-01-24 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 143, and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate |