DE SB157 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation will bring the paramedic profession in line with all other medical professions certified through the Division of Professional Regulation Board of Medical Licensure and Discipline. It allows background investigations and disciplinary action to be taken in the event of unprofessional conduct as defined by the Division of Professional Regulation Board of Medical Licensure and Discipline, including behavior during professional activity that is likely to endanger the public’s health, safety or welfare.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Paramedic Licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2016-03-23 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |