DE SB200 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Amendment HA 1 to SB 200 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Amendment HA 1 to SB 200 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides important consumer protections for property insurance contracts by improving the reliability of mailed notifications of policy cancellation or renewal. Section 1 of this bill requires insurers to deliver any homeowners notices of cancellation or nonrenewal by USPS certified mail or USPS Intelligent Mail barcode. Further, whereas currently an insurer can cancel or non-renew a policy because of two non-weather-related claims over the lifetime of the policy, this legislation provides a reasonable claims lookback period for non-weather-related claims, as is already the case for claims in other portions of this subsection of the Code. Section 2 of this bill precludes an insurance carrier from refusing to renew a homeowners policy based on non-weather claims unless 2 or more claims occur within the 36-month period immediately preceding the expiration of the current policy period.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Property Insurance Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 200 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-03-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-13 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |
2024-03-12 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-03-12 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 200 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-03-11 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 200 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-01-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-01-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate |