DE SB209 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This act adds adult sibling of a decedent to the definition of next of kin in Chapter 47 of Title 29 of the Delaware Code relating to the Division of Forensic Science. This expansion of the definition of next of kin will, for example, allow the Medical Examiner to release the personal property of a decedent to an adult sibling of a decedent, when there is no other next of kin. It will also allow the Medical Examiner to provide a copy of a post mortem examination report to an adult sibling, upon written request, when there is no other next of kin.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Division Of Forensic Science And The Definition Of Next Of Kin.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-21 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2024-03-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-03-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2024-01-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |