DE SB212 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Assigned to Administration Committee in House
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Assigned to Administration Committee in House
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Like Senate Bill No. 212, Senate Substitute No. 1 for Senate Bill No. 212 codifies the Bureau of Health Equity (BHE) in the Division of Public Health, which includes the Office of Minority Health and the Office of Womens Health. The purpose of the BHE is to ensure that everyone in Delaware will achieve their full health potential by eliminating health disparities, particularly among all racial and ethnic minority groups. The BHE works with communities to address social determinants of health, focusing on prevention, health, and wellness in the broader population instead of treatment focused on individuals. Health disparities are preventable differences in the quality of health or health care between 2 or more groups of people based on a shared characteristic of the individuals within each group, such as race, ethnicity, or socioeconomic status and the differences between the groups regarding access to health care or burdens, prevalence, or incidence of disease or violence.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Bureau Of Health Equity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2024-03-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |
2024-03-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-11 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 212, and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |