DE SB217 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Historically, vehicles under the control of the Delaware State Fire Commission have been equipped with emergency lights. This bill amends Section 4106 to clarify and confirm that vehicles of the Delaware State Fire Prevention Commission are emergency vehicles that may be equipped with emergency lights.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Emergency Vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. William Carson [D] | Rep. Sherry Dorsey Walker [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] |
Rep. Daniel Short [R] | Rep. Stephen Smyk [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-07 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2022-04-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate |