DE SB228 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on October 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on October 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows licensed veterinary technicians, as well as licensed veterinarians, to administer rabies vaccinations to dogs, cats, and ferrets.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Veterinary Technicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-11 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House | |
2022-05-10 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-05-10 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 228 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2022-04-11 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 228 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-03-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate |