DE SB238 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Delaware City Charter to provide that the Mayor and Council may impose a 3% tax on gross rental income for any lot operating a park for recreational vehicles, load or truck campers, camping trailers, travel trailers, trailers, or motorhomes, located within the boundaries of the city.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Delaware City Relating To Revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2022-03-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-16 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2022-03-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-03-15 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 238 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-03-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-09 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 238 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-03-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |