DE SB26 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Sections 1 and 2 of this Act make clear that an individual who is the subject of a false report is a victim and is entitled to restitution and the benefits of the Victims Bill of Rights.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 And Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Falsely Reporting An Incident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2019-05-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-05-16 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 26 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-05-16 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2019-05-15 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate |