DE SB264 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill makes changes to the method of selection of members of the Adult Correction Health Care Review Committee, clarifying that members be appointed by the Governor and providing that particular organizations may make recommendations to the Governor for particular appointments. The Bill also removes any term limit.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Adult Correction Health Care Review Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee (CORRECTIONS) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2016-06-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADULT & JUVENILE CORRECTIONS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Assigned to Adult & Juvenile Corrections Committee in Senate |