DE SB37 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires a mammography service provider to provide specific notice to a patient if that patient presents with dense breast tissue.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Mammograms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-02 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Stricken |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |