GA HB10 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Brookhaven to levy an excise tax pursuant to the authority of subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A., approved May 8, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, p. 3992), so as to repeal provisions regarding expenditure of funds; to repeal an automatic reversion; to repeal a conditional provision; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Brookhaven, City of; expenditure of funds; repeal provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-11-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-11-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-11-10 | House | House First Readers |
2021-11-10 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/60932 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/2021EX/202816 |