GA HB1007 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Pelham; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and property of the city; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide a specific repealer; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pelham, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #491 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Vote #565 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Vote #565 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-28 | Act 496 | |
2016-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-11 | House | House Hopper |