GA HB1034 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to amend, revise, consolidate, and supersede the several Acts incorporating the Town of Tallulah Falls in Habersham and Rabun counties, approved February 6, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 3547), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 22, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 4384), so as to change certain provisions relating to quorum, voting, and special meetings of the town council; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for the other purposes.
Title
Tallulah Falls, Town of; town council; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #625 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 511 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House Hopper |