GA HB1046 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Act 471
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Act 471
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-13-72, Code Section 31-6-2, and Article 7 of Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the sale, distribution, or possession of dangerous drugs, definitions relative to state health planning and development, and home health agencies, respectively, so as to authorize advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants to order home healthcare services; to amend Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to professions and businesses; to authorize the Georgia Board of Nursing to establish a professional health program to provide for monitoring and rehabilitation of impaired healthcare professionals; to repeal the prohibition on delegating to advanced practice registered nurses the authority to sign death certificates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants to order home healthcare services; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. David Clark [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Carter Barrett [R] |
Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] | Rep. David Huddleston [R] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute: Senate Vote #883 (Y: 47 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #803 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #730 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #646 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #803 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #730 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #646 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Act 471 | |
2024-04-23 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House Hopper |