GA HB1060 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Ports Authority, so as to provide for the comprehensive revision of provisions regarding such authority; to change certain provisions regarding definitions; to change certain provisions regarding projects and facilities; to change certain provisions regarding powers of such authority; to change certain provisions regarding revenue bonds; to change certain provision regarding fees, rentals, and charges; to change certain provisions regarding operational duties; to change certain provision regarding status, investment, sale, and reinvestment of moneys; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Ports Authority; comprehensive revisions; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Barnard [R] | Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Rep. Cecily Hill [R] | Rep. Larry O'Neal [R] |
Rep. Butch Parrish [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #778 - Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #756 - Motion To Engross Hb 333, Hb 963, Hb 1060,hb 1191,hb 1192,hb 1198,hb 1221 (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #756 - Motion To Engross Hb 333, Hb 963, Hb 1060,hb 1191,hb 1192,hb 1198,hb 1221 (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-03 | Act 628 | |
2010-06-03 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-17 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-04 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-03 | House First Readers |