GA HB1086 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating one or more community improvement districts in the City of Kingsland, approved May 6, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 4135), so as to change a certain provision relating to debts of the district; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Kingsland; City of; change certain provision relating to debts of district
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #587 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Vote #714 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Vote #714 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 426 | |
2014-04-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Transmits House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-25 | House | House Hopper |