GA HB1104 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to revise the homestead exemption for Muscogee County formerly provided for by a local constitutional amendment duly ratified at the 1982 general election (Res. Act No. 76, House Resolution No. 271, Ga. L. 1981, p. 1926), which local constitutional amendment was continued in force and effect as statutory law pursuant to Article VII, Section II, Paragraph IV of the Constitution and provides for the valuation of certain homestead property of Muscogee County for purposes of ad valorem taxation for school and consolidated city-county government purposes; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Muscogee County; homestead exemption; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] |
Rep. John Pezold [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #709 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Vote #721 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Vote #721 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-28 | Act 506 | |
2016-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-29 | House | House Hopper |