GA HB1113 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - House Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - House Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of DeKalb County to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Karla Drenner [D] | Rep. Michele Henson [D] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] |
Rep. Howard Mosby [D] | Rep. Pam Stephenson [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #858 - Remove From Table (Y: 67 N: 91 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #857 - Table (Y: 87 N: 69 NV: 19 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #855 - Recon Removal (Y: 64 N: 103 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #854 - Remove From Local Calen (Y: 100 N: 65 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #723 - Table (Y: 107 N: 42 NV: 20 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #721 - Remove From Local Calen (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 30 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #614 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House Vote #533 - Local Calendar (Y: 124 N: 10 NV: 23 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House Vote #532 - Loc Calendar W/e Hb1113 (Y: 88 N: 40 NV: 29 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #857 - Table (Y: 87 N: 69 NV: 19 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #855 - Recon Removal (Y: 64 N: 103 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #854 - Remove From Local Calen (Y: 100 N: 65 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #723 - Table (Y: 107 N: 42 NV: 20 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #721 - Remove From Local Calen (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 30 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #614 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House Vote #533 - Local Calendar (Y: 124 N: 10 NV: 23 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House Vote #532 - Loc Calendar W/e Hb1113 (Y: 88 N: 40 NV: 29 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House Tabled | |
2012-03-29 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-03-29 | House Taken from Table | |
2012-03-21 | House Tabled | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-23 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-22 | House First Readers |