GA HB1116 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of DeKalb County, formerly known as the Civil and Criminal Court of DeKalb County, approved February 14, 1951 (Ga. L. 1951, p. 2401), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 3, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 3501), so as to provide for the payment of costs in such court; to provide for a failure to appear fee in such court; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County; State Court; provide for the payment of costs
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Taylor Bennett [D] | Rep. Pam Stephenson [D] |
Rep. Tom Taylor [R] | Rep. Michele Henson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Vote #723 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Vote #723 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-28 | Act 514 | |
2016-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-02 | House | House Hopper |