GA HB1146 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Veto V10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Veto V10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to reconstitute the board of education for the Effingham County School District, approved March 26, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4596), as amended, so as to change the compensation for members of the board; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Effingham County; board of education; change compensation for members
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #707 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Vote #764 (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Vote #764 (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Veto V10 | |
2014-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House Hopper |