GA HB1151 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting or supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations with proceeds disbursed to the general fund and the agency, fund, or nonprofit corporation, so as to establish a specialty license plate honoring alumni of Southern University; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; Southern University Alumni; establish
Sponsors
Rep. Dewey McClain [D] | Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Rep. Lynn Gladney [D] |
Rep. Matt Barton [R] | Rep. Gregg Kennard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-06 | House | House Hopper |