GA HB1169 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the Town of Cadwell; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for a governing authority of such town and the powers, duties, authority, election, terms, method of filling vacancies, compensation, qualifications, prohibitions, and removal from office relative to members of such governing authority; to provide for inquiries and investigations; to provide for organization and procedures; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to repeal a specific Act; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cadwell, Town of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #554 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Vote #583 - Local Calendar (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Vote #583 - Local Calendar (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 584 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-18 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-16 | House First Readers |