GA HB1180 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-7-40.26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income tax credits for film, gaming, video, or digital production, so as to revise a definition; to provide for an application requirement; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax credit; film, gaming, video, or digital production; revise a definition
Sponsors
Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. Devan Seabaugh [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #609 (Y: 131 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House Hopper |