GA HB120 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a salary supplement for each judge of the Superior Court of the Bell-Forsyth Judicial Circuit, approved April 19, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 3680), so as to increase the amount of such supplement; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bell-Forsyth Judicial Circuit; Superior Court judges; increase salary supplement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #249 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #127 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-04-30 Act 93
2019-04-30HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-06HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-05HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback