GA HB1227 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Gainesville; to provide for reincorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for general powers and limitations on powers; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for submission under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal a specific Act; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Gainesville, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #685 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Vote #695 - Local Calendar W/o Hb 1230 & Hb 1235 (Y: 146 N: 4 NV: 18 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Vote #695 - Local Calendar W/o Hb 1230 & Hb 1235 (Y: 146 N: 4 NV: 18 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 475 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-14 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-14 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers |