GA HB124 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to reincorporate the Town of Centralhatchee in the County of Heard and the State of Georgia, approved March 21, 1974 (Ga. L. 1974, p. 2347), as amended, so as to provide for a municipal court; to provide for the judges and staff of such court; to provide for powers, duties, and responsibilities of such judges; to provide for procedures and rules of the court; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Centralhatchee, Town of; provide for a municipal court
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #188 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Vote #22 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Vote #22 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 94 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House Hopper |