GA HB1250 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create the board of elections of Murray County, approved March 12, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 4009), so as to create the Murray County Board of Elections and Registration; to change the manner of selection of members of the board of elections and registration; to provide for certain qualifications for members of the board; to provide for the certification of appointments; to provide for filling of vacancies; to provide for oaths of office; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Murray County Board of Elections and Registration; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #669 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Vote #700 - Local Calendar (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Vote #700 - Local Calendar (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 484 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-19 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-14 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-13 | House First Readers |