GA HB1288 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to re-create and reconstitute the Hart County Water and Sewer Authority; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for the purposes, powers, duties, and functions of the authority and authorize certain contracts and agreements; to repeal a certain Act; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hart County Water and Sewer Authority; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #725 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #722 - Local Calendar Without Hb 1113 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 19 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Vote #722 - Local Calendar Without Hb 1113 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 19 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 549 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-09 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-20 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House First Readers |