GA HB1297 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state and other flags, so as to provide that state and local government agencies buy American when procuring flags of the United States or state flags; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; agencies buy American when procuring flags of the United States or state flags; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Thomas [R] | Rep. David Clark [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Rep. Carter Barrett [R] |
Rep. Jordan Ridley [R] | Rep. Mitchell Horner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-16 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67128 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/224371 |