GA HB1301 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act making provisions for the Magistrate Court of Chatham County and abolishing the Municipal Court of Savannah, approved March 28, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 4422), as amended, so as to provide for qualifications for magistrates; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chatham County Magistrate Court; qualifications for magistrates; provide
Sponsors
Rep. R Bryant [D] | Rep. Craig Gordon [D] | Rep. Ann Purcell [R] | Rep. Edward Stephens [D] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #731 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-20 | House First Readers |