GA HB1319 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a homestead exemption from City of Buford ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes for the full value of the homestead for residents of that city who are 70 years of age or over, approved May 6, 2005, (Ga. L. 2005 p. 3893), so as to lower the age for the exemption; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Buford, City of; ad valorem tax for municipal purposes; lower age for exemption
Sponsors
Rep. David Clark [R] | Rep. Soo Hong [R] | Rep. Farooq Mughal [D] | Rep. Derrick McCollum [R] |
Rep. Matt Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #688 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #585 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #585 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Hopper |