GA HB133 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 5 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to current income tax payment, so as to provide for conditions of refunding de minimis overpayments; to provide for waiver of de minimis insufficiencies; to provide an effective date; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax payment; de minimis overpayments and insufficiencies; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] |
Rep. Ed Rynders [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #892 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #347 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 94 N: 63 NV: 20 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #315 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #289 - Motion To Engross (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #204 - Passage (Y: 165 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #347 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 94 N: 63 NV: 20 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #315 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #289 - Motion To Engross (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #204 - Passage (Y: 165 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-01-31 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-01-31 | House Insists | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Insists | |
2011-04-14 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2011-04-14 | House Reconsidered | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Engrossed | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-16 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-08 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-03 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-02 | House First Readers |