GA HB1330 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act known as the "South Cobb Development Authority Act," approved April 12, 1982 (Ga. L. 1982, p. 3772), as amended, so as to change the name of the authority to the Mableton Development Authority; to revise the short title; to revise provisions related to the selection of membership of the authority; to provide for continuation in office of current board members; to provide for the selection of board officers; to revise the geographical area of operations of the authority; to revise the purposes and objectives of the authority; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mableton Development Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #880 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #660 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #660 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Hopper |