GA HB1336 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to insurance generally, so as to allow a plan sponsor of a health benefit plan to consent on behalf of a covered person to the electronic transmittal or electronic posting of such plan; to allow the covered person to opt out of such electronic transmittal or electronic posting; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; plan sponsor of health benefit plan to consent on behalf of a covered person to the electronic transmittal or electronic posting of such plan; allow
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67218 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/224656 |