GA HB1341 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Board of Commissioners of Pickens County; to provide for continuation of certain obligations and liabilities; to provide for the composition of the board; to provide for elections and terms of office; to provide for qualifications; to provide for commissioner districts; to provide for the appointment of a clerk; to provide for a county administrator or manager under certain circumstances; to provide for filling of vacancies; to provide for effective dates and automatic repeals; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pickens County Board of Commissioners; create
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Graves [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #572 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 558 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-16 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-16 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-11 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-10 | House First Readers |