GA HB1346 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act amending an Act providing a new board of commissioners of Henry County, approved March 19, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4464), so as to repeal a certain provision requiring board members to resign if standing for election to other public office; to provide that such provision should not be a part of an Act approved March 28, 1974 (Ga. L. 1974, p. 3680); to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Henry County; require board member to resign if stand for other election; repeal provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Baker [D] | Rep. Steve Davis [R] | Rep. John Lunsford [R] | Rep. Rahn Mayo [D] |
Rep. Howard Mosby [D] | Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #743 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 600 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-17 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-16 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-11 | House First Readers |